CO HB1158 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the regulation of charitable solicitations by the secretary of state, and, in connection therewith, modifying and clarifying filing requirements and enforcement of the 'Colorado Charitable Solicitations Act'.
Title
Charitable Solicitations Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1158 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment B). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |