CO HB1158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Sales & Use Tax Refund For Data Centers
Title
Sales & Use Tax Refund For Data Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1158, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2015-04-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Finance + Appropriations |