CO HB1158 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cottage Foods Act
Title
Cottage Foods Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1158, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | Senate | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-21 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-19 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-02-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |