CO HB1156 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adult Pretrial Diversion Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Pretrial Diversion Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.014 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.014 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW - amended The motion passed on a vote of 10-0. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1156, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-28HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-05-08HouseSent to the Governor
2013-05-01HouseHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2013-04-30SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-04-29SenateSenate Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-24SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-23SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-19SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-04-15SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2013-04-09SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-04-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-03HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-04-02HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-01HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily with Amendments
2013-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-03-08HouseHouse Second Reading Referred to Appropriations
2013-03-05HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-29HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156app.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/A7818BA15EDAD09B87257AEE00572BE1/$FILE/1156_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1FAA3C144D08644087257B25007AA4D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/239A4BE14F371EAE87257B25007A8C0B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C6EE6F888BCF497B87257B3B00502952
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/677B7B9566BEE4BB87257B3B005021EA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B40F376040B5B2A887257B4E007304C0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A73A3BF37CA97D5187257B4E0072FDCE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4DCB9CFF0479F35487257B520051C9FF
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/239A4BE14F371EAE87257B25007A8C0B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1FAA3C144D08644087257B25007AA4D5
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C6EE6F888BCF497B87257B3B00502952
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/677B7B9566BEE4BB87257B3B005021EA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B40F376040B5B2A887257B4E007304C0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/A73A3BF37CA97D5187257B4E0072FDCE
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4DCB9CFF0479F35487257B520051C9FF

Bill Comments 750

feedback