CO HB1153 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-11 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ownership Tax Rental Mobile Machinery Electronic
Title
Ownership Tax Rental Mobile Machinery Electronic
Sponsors
Rep. Max Tyler [D] | Sen. Evie Hudak [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.003, which provides clarifying language regarding the remittance of tax payments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.002, which makes technical changes to the bill's effective date (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.003, which provides clarifying language regarding the remittance of tax payments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.002, which makes technical changes to the bill's effective date (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion was withdrawn and the bill was laid over. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion was withdrawn and the bill was laid over. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.003, which provides clarifying language regarding the remittance of tax payments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.002, which makes technical changes to the bill's effective date (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.003, which provides clarifying language regarding the remittance of tax payments (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amendment L.002, which makes technical changes to the bill's effective date (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion was withdrawn and the bill was laid over. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion was withdrawn and the bill was laid over. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1153, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-11 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2013-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |