CO HB1152 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning eliminating the requirement that a student member of the state student advisory council for community colleges and occupational education must be an in-state student for tuition purposes prior to election to the state student advisory council for community colleges and occupational education.
Title
State Student Advisory Council Member Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1152 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2019-03-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2019-02-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-02-12 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |