CO HB1152 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authority of a federal mineral lease district to manage a portion of the direct distribution of money from the local government mineral impact fund to counties for the benefit of impacted areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Mineral Lease District Investment Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1152 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1152, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04 Governor Signed
2017-03-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-03-29 Sent to the Governor
2017-03-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2017-03-21SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-20SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2017-02-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy
2017-02-23HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2017-02-22HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2017-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2017-02-06HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb17-1152
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_rev.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2017A/bills/2017A_1152_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2017a2017-02-15t133133z-hb17-1152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2017a2017-02-15t133133z-hb17-1152-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/htra2017a2017-02-15t133133z-hb17-1152-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520House%2520Journal.pdf#313
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/sagr2017a2017-03-15t110127z-hb17-1152-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/2017%2520Senate%2520Journal.pdf#480

Bill Comments

feedback