CO HB1150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Land Coordination
Title
Federal Land Coordination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1150 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1150 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1150 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed on a vote of 10-3. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 14-1150 indefinitely (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1150 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Postpone Indefinitely |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations |