CO HB1143 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning additional public health protections regarding alleged environmental violations, and, in connection therewith, raising the maximum fines for air quality and water quality violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Justice And Projects Increase Environmental Fines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1143 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1143 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment F). (Y: 3 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 20-1143, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-02 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-06-08SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-06-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2020-06-05HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-27HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHouse Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Finance
2020-01-17HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1143
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1143_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4781c769c20b40868725850a007255f9-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4781c769c20b40868725850a007255f9-hb20-1143-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4781c769c20b40868725850a007255f9-hb20-1143-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/703e66ce644564dc8725851b006b3470-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/703e66ce644564dc8725851b006b3470-hb20-1143-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82137c609e01a2ef8725857c0063d32a-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82137c609e01a2ef8725857c0063d32a-hb20-1143-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e1f3df039fc88f4a8725857c0062c25d-hb20-1143-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e1f3df039fc88f4a8725857c0062c25d-hb20-1143-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/82137c609e01a2ef8725857c0063d32a-hb20-1143-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e1f3df039fc88f4a8725857c0062c25d-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1143vote052013
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/78f5b9955076e3bb872585820018123a-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c0130219f8db606d8725858200697cd1-hb20-1143-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1143vote57b1f7

Bill Comments

feedback