CO HB1142 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rural & Frontier Health Care Preceptor Tax Credit

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rural & Frontier Health Care Preceptor Tax Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1142, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-06HouseGovernor Signed
2016-05-18HouseSent to the Governor
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2016-05-10SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-09SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-09SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2016-05-09SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2016-05-06SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2016-05-06HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2016-05-05HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2016-05-05HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2016-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-03-17HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2016-02-16HouseHouse Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services + Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142phc_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142fin.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/7B5556D63DBF129587257F240064250E/$FILE/1142_signed.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01A72D4F3D90864587257F5B007801E2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01A72D4F3D90864587257F5B007801E2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/Clics2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6199CC56F4F7D4E187257F5B00775C2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/Clics2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/01A72D4F3D90864587257F5B007801E2
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/612718B5FFA4234387257F79006612D0
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/6199CC56F4F7D4E187257F5B00775C2C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4B8D371E89FECA5287257F79006602A1
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/47C7C51C3CA9C6B387257FAA0051D11B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B256690F6B431D2787257FAE006D53E7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2016a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C68B71E0EC96AC9887257FAE00767E6C
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jouhse)/518BE8ABE846333387257FAB0055E647/$FILE/My06.pdf#1274
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/csljournals.nsf/(jousen)/AEF6AB6E821B43B687257FAF004EEC70/$FILE/jour_119.pdf#1163
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B256690F6B431D2787257FAE006D53E7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/47C7C51C3CA9C6B387257FAA0051D11B
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2016A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C68B71E0EC96AC9887257FAE00767E6C

Bill Comments

feedback