CO HB1142 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit Electronic Sale Of Lottery Tickets
Title
Prohibit Electronic Sale Of Lottery Tickets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1142 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-03 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-03 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-31 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-20 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-03-20 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-12 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |