CO HB1141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the removal of outdated references in statute to "early childhood care and education councils".
Title
Modernize Early Childhood Council Language
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1141 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 18-1141 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 18-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed | |
2018-03-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-02-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |