CO HB1141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confidentiality Social Security Numbers
Title
Confidentiality Social Security Numbers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.011 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.009 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.008 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.006 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1141, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-10 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-07 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-04-07 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-02-27 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |