CO HB1139 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - House Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Average Daily Membership For School Finance
Title
Average Daily Membership For School Finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1139, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1139, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1139, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Lost - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |