CO HB1137 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing the recommendations of the fraudulent filings working group, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Implement Fraudulent Filings Group Recommendations
Sponsors
Rep. Tisha Mauro [D] | Rep. Rick Taggart [R] | Sen. Jeff Bridges [D] | Sen. Faith Winter [D] |
Rep. Shannon Bird [D] | Rep. William Lindstedt [D] | Rep. Naquetta Ricks [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-05-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2024-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-05-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-05-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |