CO HB1137 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a requirement that the broadband deployment board give substantial weight to a local entity's written certification that an area within the entity's jurisdiction is an unserved area when considering an application for grant money for the provision of broadband service to that unserved area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Grant Certification Of Unserved Area Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1137 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1137, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1137, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1137, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-12SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-06-08SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2020-06-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-06-04SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-03-09SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-03-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-25HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1137
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_en2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1137_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-4-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-5-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-3-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9cf81f2bdfe581c28725850c0070dd11-hb20-1137-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5417e13a0dbd274287258515005338a5-hb20-1137-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/5417e13a0dbd274287258515005338a5-hb20-1137-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1137vote5b0096
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/44ccc2033ce929ab87258526006b8ce4-hb20-1137-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3ca1b4fc172a4b58725857d004dc0f2-hb20-1137-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e3ca1b4fc172a4b58725857d004dc0f2-hb20-1137-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1137vote54fff3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1137vote10a18d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1137vote108c37

Bill Comments

feedback