CO HB1136 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the regulation of investments made by domestic insurance companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Investment Regulation Modernization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.006) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.005) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 20-1136 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 20-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-11SenateSenate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-28SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
2020-02-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-24HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-21HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1136
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1136_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97c4706043f3c16d8725850b0064f9e3-hb20-1136-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97c4706043f3c16d8725850b0064f9e3-hb20-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote5c1e1d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/64282d86b0b9316a87258528006e5b34-hb20-1136-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote559029
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote5570f6
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote61ceb7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote61bafd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1136vote553660

Bill Comments

feedback