CO HB1136 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Job Protection Civil Rights Enforcement Act 2013
Title
Job Protection Civil Rights Enforcement Act 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.040 (Attachment H) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.040 (Attachment H) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee on Judiciary The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee on Judiciary The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.040 (Attachment H) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt prepared Amendment L.040 (Attachment H) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee on Judiciary The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.009 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - SUBSTITUTE MOTION - Refer House Bill 13-1136 to the Committee on Judiciary The motion failed on a vote of 5-8. (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - House - FINAL VOTE - L.008 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment H) (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1136, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-19 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |