CO HB1134 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning facilitating the reporting of tenants' rent payment information to consumer reporting agencies at the tenants' request, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Report Tenant Rent Payment Information To Credit Agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1134 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1134 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1134, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004, as amended by L.005 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1134, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-22SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-04SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-24SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-05-19SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-04-01HouseHouse Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-03-01HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1134
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1134_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_L.005.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_L.004.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_L.007.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_L.008.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1134_L.006.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1134_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1134_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1134_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1134_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3843f1d32f4ef7d4872586aa0080a9bd-hb21-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3843f1d32f4ef7d4872586aa0080a9bd-hb21-1134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3843f1d32f4ef7d4872586aa0080a9bd-hb21-1134-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/012625d2ddd9ccc0872586d5004e9351-hb21-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/012625d2ddd9ccc0872586d5004e9351-hb21-1134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1134vote54592e
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cfede9e3263f4d79872586df0068b1a1-hb21-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/3443f96e7cd84424872586e9004e14f2-hb21-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1134vote5b1110

Bill Comments 750

feedback