CO HB1134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning researching effective methods for assisting early-grade students with dyslexia, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification And Interventions For Students With Dyslexia

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1134 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 19-1134 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1134, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1134, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 19-1134, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Signed
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1134
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1134_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/887c93ae9fd7dc66872583af00755c43-hb19-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/887c93ae9fd7dc66872583af00755c43-hb19-1134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a662d8b8eef62bba872583da004b7db1-hb19-1134-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/a662d8b8eef62bba872583da004b7db1-hb19-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1134vote5a611c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2d8420b8c7b35eec872583e700729bcc-hb19-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/f24bd341415c993e872583e8004eecc5-hb19-1134-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1134vote670d25

Bill Comments

feedback