CO HB1131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to reduce justice-involvement for young children, and, in connection therewith, focus on prevention and age-appropriate interventions and making an appropriation.
Title
Reduce Justice-involvement For Young Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 38 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-22 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.022 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.021 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.020 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.019 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.018 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.016 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.014 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.011 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.007 (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1131, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |