CO HB1130 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes To CDE Reports
Title
Changes To CDE Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.003 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-03-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-04 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-03-04 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2016-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |