CO HB1130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Cure Remit Unpaid Fees To Borrower
Title
Foreclosure Cure Remit Unpaid Fees To Borrower
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1130, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-17 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-04-17 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |