CO HB1128 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the creation of a special license plate for end-of-life care, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospice And Palliative Care License Plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1128 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 21-1128 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-05-19SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-18SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-04SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-04-21SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2021-04-19HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-16HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-04-15HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2021-04-13HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-24HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-02-22HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1128
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_rv2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1128_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1128_J.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1128_00.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1128_hse.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1128_sen.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1c518107caae185d872586a2006b9a26-hb21-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97e9519d9f89f957872586b6004e9322-hb21-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/97e9519d9f89f957872586b6004e9322-hb21-1128-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1128vote7029f9
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ab8300c60cb7d6b3872586cb0070b422-hb21-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fcc4c90e3407dc93872586d5004e3fbb-hb21-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1128vote569457

Bill Comments 750

feedback