CO HB1128 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning education requirements for educators to increase awareness of special education issues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educator Education Requirements Special Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 20-1128, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1128 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 20-1128, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-14SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2020-03-14SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-13SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2020-03-12SenateSenate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
2020-02-21HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-20HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-02-18HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-04HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-15HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1128
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1128_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1128_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1128_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1128_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1128_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/00d69ee59f9d8db487258504007c4240-hb20-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7f1a26570218dd4e8725850e0053e86e-hb20-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/00d69ee59f9d8db487258504007c4240-hb20-1128-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1128vote5c21f1
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8612e3c0a47cbf7f87258529006d46e1-hb20-1128-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1128vote55cb6b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1128vote60df8b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1128vote60ccea
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8612e3c0a47cbf7f87258529006d46e1-hb20-1128-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback