CO HB1126 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the permissible regulation of dogs in common interest communities.
Title
Limit Homeowners' Association Regulation Of Dogs By Size Or Breed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - House - House Local Government: Refer House Bill 18-1126, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/22/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |