CO HB1115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the establishment of direct primary health care agreements to operate without regulation by the division of insurance.
Title
Direct Primary Health Care Services
Sponsors
Rep. Perry Buck [R] | Sen. Joann Ginal [D] | Sen. John Tate [R] | Sen. John Kefalas [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) to amendment L.001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to House Bill 17-1115. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Amendment (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment F) to amendment L.001. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C) to House Bill 17-1115. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1115, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-06 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-04 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2017-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-02 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |