CO HB1112 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-8)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-8)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization for a school district to establish a scholarship program for school district graduates using the school district's locally received money.
Title
School District Scholarship Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1112, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-03-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |