CO HB1112 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning covered health care services provided by a pharmacist.
Title
Pharmacist Health Care Services Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1112 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2018-04-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |