CO HB1110 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special Fuel Tax & Electric Vehicle Fee
Title
Special Fuel Tax & Electric Vehicle Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) as an amendment to L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) as an amendment to L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.004 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-21 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) as an amendment to L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment F) as an amendment to L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E), as amended (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1110, as amended, to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee on Finance Re-Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Finance |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations |