CO HB1109 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Apply Protection Orders To Parolees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Apply Protection Orders To Parolees

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-15HouseGovernor Action - Signed
2013-03-08HouseSent to the Governor
2013-03-06SenateSenate Third Reading Passed
2013-03-05SenateSenate Second Reading Passed
2013-03-04SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2013-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2013-02-14SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2013-02-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed
2013-02-11HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed
2013-02-07HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2013-01-18HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/3B1B8C095BE77A1587257AEE005822AD/$FILE/1109_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5FC2B142AF77329487257B0B007D7D69
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2013a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D26922E7AE6708BD87257B1F0076DDDA
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/5FC2B142AF77329487257B0B007D7D69
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2013A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/D26922E7AE6708BD87257B1F0076DDDA

Bill Comments

feedback