CO HB1105 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Hospital Worker Assault Protection

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital Worker Assault Protection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1105, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-02 Governor Action - Signed
2011-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2011-05-19 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2011-05-18 Signed by the President of the Senate
2011-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2011-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2011-05-09 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-05-09 Senate Third Reading Passed
2011-05-09 Senate Third Reading Reconsidered
2011-05-06 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2011-05-05 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily
2011-05-02 Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/06/2011
2011-04-28 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-04-25 Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-03-07 Senate Second Reading Referred to Judiciary
2011-03-01 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2011-02-24 Senate Committee on Health and Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2011-02-14 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health and Human Services + Judiciary
2011-02-09 House Third Reading Passed
2011-02-08 House Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-02-03 House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2011-01-21 Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105jud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105sjud_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/FB6FAF9B430AB120872578160064D3D8/$FILE/1105_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF56952A3FE575628725782C0083A1D7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B013420B3A516BB7872578420008897D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0B4177DB6052A5AF8725787D0079844F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF56952A3FE575628725782C0083A1D7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B013420B3A516BB7872578420008897D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2011a/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0B4177DB6052A5AF8725787D0079844F
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/AF56952A3FE575628725782C0083A1D7
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/B013420B3A516BB7872578420008897D
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/Clics/CLICS2011A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/0B4177DB6052A5AF8725787D0079844F

Bill Comments

feedback