CO HB1100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pass-through child support payments to families that are eligible for temporary assistance for needy families.
Title
Pass-through Child Support Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 20-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-24 | Governor Signed | |
2020-03-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-03-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2020-02-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-19 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2020-02-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 02/17/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |