CO HB1100 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sales Tax Revenue To Older Coloradans Cash Fund
Title
Sales Tax Revenue To Older Coloradans Cash Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1100 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Postpone House Bill 15-1100 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1100, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |