CO HB1097 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Goodwill Industries Tax Checkoff
Title
Goodwill Industries Tax Checkoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW - unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1097 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-18 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-04-15 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-01 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-18 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-21 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-18 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-02 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-01-26 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |