CO HB1093 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election List Maintenance Procedures
Title
Election List Maintenance Procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Ransom [R] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 16-1093 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 16-1093 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed upon the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 16-1093 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) to House Bill 16-1093 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1093, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2016-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-01 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |