CO HB1092 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create CO Youth Conservation Corps Tax Checkoff
Title
Create CO Youth Conservation Corps Tax Checkoff
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-01-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1092 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2014-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-23 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |