CO HB1090 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning measures to allow greater investment flexibility in marijuana businesses, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publicly Licensed Marijuana Companies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1090 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1090 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1090, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment G) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1090, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 19-1090, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
2019-03-29HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-03-28HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-01-14HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1090
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1090_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1090_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1090_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1090_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1090_rer.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/04689f3751579039872583b30079a334-hb19-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/04689f3751579039872583b30079a334-hb19-1090-2-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/04689f3751579039872583b30079a334-hb19-1090-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8399984d1425410f872583ca004ad8d5-hb19-1090-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8399984d1425410f872583ca004ad8d5-hb19-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1090vote552000
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2c4b73d53af80a16872583e0006380c3-hb19-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/ec9bd8a45e794517872583e5004b67a1-hb19-1090-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1090vote6dc7fa

Bill Comments

feedback