CO HB1089 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-9)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of electronic notifications for vehicle transactions, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Vehicle Electronic Notifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-04 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Joint - CC_HB24-1089_2024A: Adopt the conference committee report CLHB1089.002 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reconsider (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-04 - House - House: Conference Committee Report Adopt (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Repass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Conference Committee Report Adopt Ccr (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Joint - CC_HB24-1089_2024A: Adopt the conference committee report CLHB1089.002 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - House: Senate Amendments Not Cncr (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reconsider (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment B). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment A). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1089 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1089, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment C). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2024-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-04 | House | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass |
2024-04-29 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2024-04-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee |
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over to 04/22/2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-01-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |