CO HB1088 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning signature verification for candidate petitions filed with the secretary of state.
Title
Voter Signature Verification & Electronic Petition Pilot
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt a conceptual amendment, page 1 of amendment L.003, line 23, strike "(1)" and substitute "(1.5)". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1088 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt a conceptual amendment, page 1 of amendment L.003, line 23, strike "(1)" and substitute "(1.5)". (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1088, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-05 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |