CO HB1083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Acute Treatment Units Stock Medications
Title
Acute Treatment Units Stock Medications
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Lee [D] | Sen. Larry Crowder [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1083 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-02-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-01-31 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-01-28 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |