CO HB1081 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LPG Vehicles Included For Incentives
Title
LPG Vehicles Included For Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee of the Whole, as amended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1081 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-11 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-06 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Energy | |
2011-05-06 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-05 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-04 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-25 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-01-31 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Finance | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Finance + Appropriations |