CO HB1078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the repeal of the Colorado family support loan program, and, in connection therewith, transferring funds from the Colorado family support loan program to the family support services program to provide services for families of persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Title
Transfer Funds From Family Support Loan Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1078 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1078 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1078, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed | |
2017-03-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2017-02-06 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-02-03 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |