CO HB1077 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the penalty for a person who commits burglary to acquire firearms, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Penalty For Burglary Of Firearms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1077 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1077 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Adopt amendment L.005 [Attachment A]. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House State, Veterans, and Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1077, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-24 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |