CO HB1069 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow City To Set Housing Auth Commn Term Length
Title
Allow City To Set Housing Auth Commn Term Length
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1069 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-03-01 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-02-23 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2016-02-02 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-02-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-01-28 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |