CO HB1069 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physical Activity Expectation In Schools
Title
Physical Activity Expectation In Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the first report of the first conference committee on HB 11-1069, which adopts the rerevised version of the bill with amendments (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the first report of the first conference committee on HB 11-1069, which adopts the rerevised version of the bill with amendments (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the first report of the first conference committee on HB 11-1069, which adopts the rerevised version of the bill with amendments (Attachment A) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1069, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-04-05 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-03-29 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2011-03-16 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education | |
2011-02-15 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-14 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-07 | House Committee on Education Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |