CO HB1063 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emer Service Providers Critical Care Endorsement
Title
Emer Service Providers Critical Care Endorsement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1063 to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1063 to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 13-1063 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 1 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 13-1063 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 1 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1063 to the Committee of the Whole with the recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 13-1063 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 1 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to reconsider House Bill 13-1063 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 1 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-01-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to the Committee of the Whole, as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-01-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-25 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-01-22 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |