CO HB1059 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Restrict Local Government Accident Fees
Title
Restrict Local Government Accident Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1059 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1059 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 11-1059 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely House Bill 11-1059 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to postpone indefinitely HB 11-1059 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1059, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee on Local Government Postpone Indefinitely | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government | |
2011-03-02 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-01 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-28 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-23 | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |