CO HB1057 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Statewide Initiative Process
Title
The Statewide Initiative Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.062 (Attachment A) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.064 (Attachment C) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.096 (Attachment E) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.065 (Attachment B) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.095 (Attachment D) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.063 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.064 (Attachment C) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.096 (Attachment E) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.065 (Attachment B) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.095 (Attachment D) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.063 (Attachment F) (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1057, as amended, to the Committee on Legislative Council (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.014 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-05-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-05-01 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2015-04-29 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-24 | House | House Committee on Legislative Council Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-04-20 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Legislative Council |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |