CO HB1056 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modernizing record keeping by the state archives.
Title
Efficiency At The State Archives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1056 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1056 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 23-1056 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2023-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-03-30 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |